Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8148 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8148 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Leo Louis Kaczmar, III, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:March 16, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC13-2247)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 16, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2018 to May 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 16, 2018.
May 16 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 16 2018Brief of State of Florida in opposition not accepted for filing. (May 22, 2018)
May 30 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard M. Bracey III
    Counsel of Record
Second Judicial Circuit of Florida
Office of Public Defender
301 S. Monroe Street, Suite 401
Tallahassee, FL 32301

mose.bracey@flpd2.com
8506061000
Party name: Leo Kaczmar
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543