Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-809
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-809
Title:Susan Stanford, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 5, 2017
Linked with 17A379
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1990)
   Decision Date:July 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2017Application (17A379) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 17, 2017 to December 1, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Oct 06 2017Application (17A379) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 1, 2017.
Dec 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 18 2018Response Requested. (Due February 20, 2018)
Feb 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2018 to March 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 22, 2018.
Mar 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 22, 2018 to April 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 4, 2018.
Apr 04 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael D. Sydow
    Counsel of Record
The Sydow Firm
5020 Montrose Boulevard
Suite 450
Houston, TX 77006

michael.sydow@thesydowfirm.com
(713) 622-9700
Party name: Susan Stanford
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543