Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-807
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-807
Vide 17-897
Title:Donivon Craig Tingle, Petitioner
v.
Sonny Perdue, Secretary of Agriculture, et al.
Docketed:December 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5189, 16-5190)
   Decision Date:May 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 5, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 5, 2018 to January 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 27 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2018, for all respondents.
Jan 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2018 to February 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 21 2018Response to motion from petitioner Donivon Craig Tingle filed.
Main Document
Jan 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 21, 2018, for all respondents.
Jan 22 2018Response motion to extend the time to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner Donivan Craig Tingle.
Main Document
Jan 22 2018Brief of respondents Porter Holder and Claryca Mandan in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed. VIDED
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 27 2018Reply of petitioner Donivon Craig Tingle filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018Petition DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Apr 20 2018Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Rehearing DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donivon Craig Tingle
    Counsel of Record
The Tingle Law Firm, PA
1012 Airport Road, Unit 1
Destin, FL 32541

tingleandassociatespa@embarqmail.com
850-650-8138
Party name: Donivon Craig Tingle
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondent
Joseph Marc Sellers
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC
1100 New York Ave., N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

jsellers@cohenmilstein.com
202-408-4600
Party name: Porter Holder and Claryca Mandan

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543