Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-806
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-806
Title:Spokeo, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Thomas Robins
Docketed:December 6, 2017
Linked with 17A493
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(11-56843)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2017Application (17A493) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2017 to December 4, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Nov 08 2017Application (17A493) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until December 4, 2017.
Dec 04 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017Brief of respondent Thomas Robins in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 03 2018Reply of petitioner Spokeo, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Trans Union LLC filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
Jan 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2018Brief amici curiae of American Escrow Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jan 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Consumer Data Industry Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Professional Background Screeners filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 05 2018Amicus brief of Trans Union LLC not accepted for filing. (January 05, 2018)
Jan 22 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Spokeo, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
571-243-9423
Party name: Thomas Robins
Other
Cindy D. Hanson
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
600 Peachtree Street, NE
Suite 5200
Atlanta, GA 30308

cindy.hanson@troutmansanders.com
404-885-3830
Party name: National Association of Professional Background Screeners
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
202-868-6915
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Rebecca Everett Kuehn
    Counsel of Record
Hudson Cook, LLP
1909 K Street, N.W.
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

rkuehn@hudco.com
202-715-2008
Party name: Consumer Data Industry Association
Stephen J. Newman
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
2029 Century Park East
Suite 1800
Los Angeles, CA 90067

snewman@stroock.com
310-556-5800
Party name: Trans Union LLC
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Jay N. Varon
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
3000 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20007

jvaron@foley.com
202-672-5380
Party name: American Escrow Association, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543