Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-8002
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-8002
Title:Quiyontay Sanders, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 6, 2018
Linked with 17A678
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10596)
   Decision Date:October 5, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2017Application (17A678) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 3, 2018 to March 4, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 03 2018Application (17A678) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 4, 2018.
Mar 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 5, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendixAppendix
Mar 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2018 to May 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2018.
May 07 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rebecca Shepard
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Program
101 Marietta Street
Suite 1500
Atlanta, GA 30303

rebecca_shepard@fd.org
404-688-7530
Party name: Quiyontay Sanders
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543