Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7952
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7952
Title:James C. Wright, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-12222)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Mar 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2018 to May 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2018.
May 02 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Danli Song
    Counsel of Record
201 South Orange Avenue
Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

danli_song@fd.org
4076486338
Party name: James Wright
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543