Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-795
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-795
Title:Michael Sammons, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 30, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-50201)
   Decision Date:June 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2018 to February 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Owners’ Counsel Of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 1, 2018.
Jan 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 1, 2018 to February 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 21, 2018.
Feb 21 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 07 2018Reply of petitioner Michael Sammons filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
Subbaraman PLLC
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

mps@subblaw.com
612-315-9210
Party name: Michael Sammons
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Mark Fernlund Hearne II
    Counsel of Record
Arent Fox, LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

thornet@ix.netcom.com
202-857-6000
Party name: Owners’ Counsel Of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543