Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7941
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7941
Title:Tremell Armstead, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 1, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30439)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 2, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Apr 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2018
Apr 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2018 to May 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 02 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Hughes v. United States, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jul 13 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Celia Rhoads
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
500 Poydras St
Suite 318
New Orleans, LA 70130

celia_rhoads@fd.org
5045897934
Party name: Tremell Armstead
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543