Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7894 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7894 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tawuan Townes, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:February 26, 2018
Linked with 17A692
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(CR-10-1892)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:March 17, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 20, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2017Application (17A692) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 18, 2018 to February 20, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 03 2018Application (17A692) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 20, 2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 28, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOther
Mar 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2018 to April 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 27, 2018.
Apr 27 2018Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
May 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
May 21 2018Record Requested.
May 29 2018Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama. The record is electronic.
Jun 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 18 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 02 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 10 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)
Nov 02 2018Audio recording of March 9, 2011, proceeding before the Circuit Court of Houston County, Alabama received.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Angela Leigh Setzer
    Counsel of Record
122 Commerce Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

asetzer@eji.org
334-269-1803
Party name: Tawuan Townes
Attorneys for Respondent
Beth Jackson Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

bhughes@ago.state.al.us
334-242-7392
Party name: State of Alabama

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543