Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-789
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-789
Title:Efrim Renteria, et al., Petitioners
v.
Superior Court of California, Tulare County, et al.
Docketed:November 29, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Fifth Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(F075331)
   Decision Date:July 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 30, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 29, 2017)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Dec 15 2017Waiver of right of respondent Regina Cuellar to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2017Waiver of right of respondent Shingle Springs Band of Miwok Indians to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Scharf-Norton Center for Constitutional Litigation
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Efrim Renteria, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
James Ralph Greiner
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of James R. Greiner
1024 Iron Point Road
Folsom , CA 95630

jaygreiner@midtown.net
9162243597
Party name: Regina Cuellar
Joseph J. Wiseman
    Counsel of Record
WISEMAN LAW CORPORATION
431 I Street
Suite 201
Sacramento, CA 95814

jjwiseman@wisemanlawcorp.com
916.668.7365
Party name: Shingle Springs Band of Miwok Indians
Other
Anastasia Paulinna Boden
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

apb@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543