Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-780
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-780
Title:John T. Morris, Appellant
v.
Texas, et al.
Docketed:November 28, 2017
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Texas
   Case Numbers:(SA-11-CV-360)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2017Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due December 28, 2017)
Dec 19 2017Waiver of right of appellee Texas, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018Appeal dismissed for want of jurisdiction.
Mar 28 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellant
John T. Morris5703 Caldicote Street
Humble, TX 77346

johnmorris1939@hotmail.com
281-852-6388
Party name: John T. Morris
Attorneys for Appellees
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
5125902655
Party name: Texas, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543