Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7793
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7793
Title:Jesus Ramirez-Hidalgo, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-20084)
   Decision Date:January 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 22, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Mar 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 22, 2018 to April 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 23, 2018.
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2018 to May 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 23, 2018.
May 23 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 25 2018Reply of petitioner Jesus Ramirez-Hidalgo filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 30 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jul 27 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kathryn Shephard
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender for the Southern District of Texas
440 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

kathryn_shephard@fd.org
7137184600
Party name: Jesus Ramirez-Hidalgo
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543