Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7769 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7769 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Ronald Gray, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 15, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(17-0525/AR)
   Decision Date:November 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 19, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Mar 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 19, 2018 to April 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 18, 2018.
Mar 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States Air Force Appellate Defense Division filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Apr 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 18, 2018 to May 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 18, 2018.
May 18 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 31 2018Reply of petitioner Ronald Gray filed.
Main Document
Jun 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Patrick Kane
    Counsel of Record
Federal Communtiy Defender Office
601 Walnut Street
Curtis Center, Suite 545 West
Philadelphia, PA 19106

timothy_kane@fd.org
215-928-0520
Party name: Ronald Gray
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Brian Lee Mizer
    Counsel of Record
Air Force Appellate Defense Division
1500 West Perimeter Road, Suite 1100
Joint Base Andrews, MD 20762

brian.l.mizer.civ@mail.mil
7039192719
Party name: United States Air Force Appellate Defense Division

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543