Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7762
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7762
Title:Steven Jackson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17173, 16-17334)
   Decision Date:November 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOtherOther
Mar 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2018 to April 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 16, 2018.
Apr 16 2018Response to petition from respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 18 2018Reply of petitioner Steven Jackson filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vanessa Louise Chen
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
150 West Flagler Street
Suite 1700
Miami, FL 33130

vanessa_chen@fd.org
305-533-4242
Party name: Steven Jackson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543