Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7747
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7747
Title:Nathaniel Beverly, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 12, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11527)
   Decision Date:November 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 08 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 14, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Mar 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 14, 2018 to April 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 13, 2018.
Apr 13 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 02 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda Greenberg Bryn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
One East Broward Boulevard
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

brenda_bryn@fd.org
954-356-7436
Party name: Nathaniel Beverly
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543