SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-7688 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-7688 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Ronnie Bowling, Petitioner
v.
Randy White, Warden
Docketed:
February 6, 2018
Linked with 17A124
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(15-6318)
Decision Date:
June 8, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
July 12, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 21 2017
Application (17A124) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 10, 2017 to December 9, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jul 27 2017
Application (17A124) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 9, 2017.
Dec 07 2017
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 8, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Mar 08 2018
Brief of respondent White, Warden in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 19 2018
Reply of petitioner Ronnie Bowling filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 22 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018
Petition DENIED.
May 04 2018
Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 22 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018
Rehearing DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ronnie Lee Bowling
#032861
Kentucky State Penitentiary
266 Water Street
Eddyville, KY 42038-7737
Party name: Ronnie Bowling
Attorneys for Respondent
Jason Bradley Moore
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1024 Capitol Center Drive
Suite 200
Frankfort, KY 40601
jason.moore2@ky.gov
502-696-5342
Party name: White, Warden
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##