SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-7685 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-7685 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Wade Greely Lay, Petitioner
v.
Terry Royal, Warden
Docketed:
February 6, 2018
Linked with 17A578
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(15-5111)
Decision Date:
June 26, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
September 5, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2017
Application (17A578) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 4, 2017 to February 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Other
Other
Nov 27 2017
Application (17A578) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 2, 2018.
Feb 02 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 8, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Mar 08 2018
Brief of respondent Terry Royal in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 22 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 11 2018
Reply of petitioner Wade Lay filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 16 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
215 Dean A. McGee
Suite 109 Old Post Office Building
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
Patti_Ghezzi@fd.org
405-609-5975
Party name: Wade Lay
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer L. Crabb
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105
fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Terry Royal
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##