Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-76
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-76
Title:Margarita Del Pilar Fitzpatrick, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:July 14, 2017
Linked with 16A1165
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2204, 16-1864)
   Decision Date:February 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 13, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2017Application (16A1165) for a stay of removal pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan.
May 26 2017Application (16A1165) denied by Justice Kagan.
Jul 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 14, 2017)
Aug 14 2017Waiver of right of respondent Jefferson B.Sessions, III, Attorney General to respond filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute in support of respondent filed. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard HanusLaw Office of Richard Hanus
161 North Clark Street
Suite 2500
Chicago, IL 60601

rhanus@usavisacounsel.com
(312) 357-0033
Party name: Margarita Del Pilar Fitzpatrick
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Sessions, Att'y Gen.
Other
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chaiec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543