Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7563
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7563
Title:Lesley William Cottman, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 26, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13006-E)
   Decision Date:October 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 26, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Feb 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2018 to March 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 28, 2018.
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2018 to April 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 27, 2018.
Apr 27 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 08 2018Reply of petitioner Lesley William Cottman filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michelle Rachel Yard
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Office
201 S. Orange Ave., Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

michelle_yard@fd.org
(407) 648-6338
Party name: Lesley William Cottman
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543