Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-756
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-756
Title:Public Service Company of New Mexico, Petitioner
v.
Lorraine Barboan, et al.
Docketed:November 22, 2017
Linked with 17A289
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2050)
   Decision Date:May 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 11 2017Application (17A289) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 19, 2017 to November 20, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Sep 15 2017Application (17A289) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 20, 2017.
Nov 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 22, 2017)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 22, 2017 to January 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 12 2017Motion of United States for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (December 28, 2017)
Dec 14 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2018, for all respondents.
Dec 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of New Mexico Oil and Gas Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2017Brief amici curiae of Edison Electric Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2017Brief amici curiae of Interstate Natural Gas Association of America and the Oklahoma Oil and Gas Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2018 to February 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 21, 2018, for all respondents.
Feb 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2018 to March 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 23, 2018, for all respondents.
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondents Navajo Nation, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 05 2018Reply of petitioner Public Service Company of New Mexico, a New Mexico Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Henry Hurd
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
1001 Haxall Point
Richmond, VA 23219

william.hurd@troutman.com
804-201-7846
Party name: Public Service Company of New Mexico, a New Mexico Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Michael Martin Mulder
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Michael M. Mulder
1603 Orrington Avenue
Suite 600
Evanston, IL 60201

mmmulder@mmulderlaw.com
312-263-0272
Party name: Lorraine J. Barboan, Laura H. Chaco, Benjamin A. House, Mary R. House, Annie H. Sorrell, Dorothy W. House, Leonard Willie, Irene Willie, Charley J. Johnson, Eloise J. Smith, Shawn Stevens
Paul Wesley Spruhan
    Counsel of Record
Navajo Naton Department of Justice
P.O. Box 2010
Window Rock, Navajo Nation, AZ 86515

pspruhan@nndoj.org
(928) 871-6229
Party name: Navajo Nation
Other
Andrew William Lester
    Counsel of Record
Spencer Fane LLP
9400 North Broadway Extension
Suite 600
Oklahoma City, OK 73114

alester@spencerfane.com
405-844-9900
Party name: Interstate Natural Gas Association of America and the Oklahoma Oil and Gas Association
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Edison Electric Institute, et al.
Lynn H. Slade
    Counsel of Record
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk, P.A.
500 Fourth Street, NW, Suite 1000
Albuquerque, NM 87102

lynn.slade@modrall.com
505-848-1800
Party name: New Mexico Oil and Gas Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543