Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7545 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7545 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Steven Anthony Cozzie, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:January 26, 2018
Linked with 17A534
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC13-2393)
   Decision Date:May 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 31, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 13 2017Application (17A534) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 29, 2017 to January 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 28 2017Application (17A534) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 28, 2018.
Jan 24 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Mar 16 2018Reply of petitioner Steven Cozzie filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Petition DENIED Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion, VIDED with No. 17-7171).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Monsel Bracey III
    Counsel of Record
Second Judicial Circuit of Florida
Office of Public Defender
301 S. Monroe Street, Suite 401
Tallahassee, FL 32301

mose.bracey@flpd2.com
8506061000
Party name: Steven Cozzie
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, AL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543