Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7521
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7521
Title:Sadonnie Marquis Kitchen, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 22, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-13691)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 21, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2018 to March 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2018.
Mar 19 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Sadonnie Kitchen filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 05 2018Reply of petitioner Sadonnie Kitchen filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
M. Allison Guagliardo
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Defender
400 North Tampa Street
Suite 2700
Tampa, FL 33602

allison_guagliardo@fd.org
813-228-2715
Party name: Sadonnie Kitchen
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543