Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7496
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7496
Title:Shannon L. Ferguson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-6303)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 19, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 20, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Feb 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2018 to March 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 22, 2018.
Mar 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 22, 2018 to April 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 23, 2018.
Apr 18 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 02 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 03 2018Reply of petitioner Shannon L. Ferguson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erin Phillippi Rust
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee
835 Georgia Ave
Suite 600
Chattanooga, TN 37402-2261

erin_rust@fd.org
(423) 756-4349
Party name: Shannon L. Ferguson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543