Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-74
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-74
Title:Markle Interests, L.L.C., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States Fish and Wildlife Service, et al.
Docketed:July 14, 2017
Linked with 16A916
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-31008)
   Decision Date:June 30, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 13, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 21 2017Application (16A916) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 14, 2017 to June 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Mar 27 2017Application (16A916) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 29, 2017.
Jun 06 2017Application (16A916) to extend further the time from June 29, 2017 to July 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jun 09 2017Application (16A916) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 13, 2017.
Jul 12 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 14, 2017)
Jul 18 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner Markle Interests, LLC.
Jul 18 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent Weyerhaeuser Company.
Jul 27 2017Waiver of right of respondent Weyerhaeuser Company to respond filed.
Aug 04 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent-intervenors, Center for Biological Diversity and Gulf Restoration Network on 08/10/2017 VIDED
Aug 09 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 13, 2017, for all respondents.
Aug 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of St. Tammany Parish filed. VIDED.
Aug 11 2017Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Aug 11 2017Brief amici curiae of Coalition for a Sustainable Delta, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of California Cattlemens Association, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of THe National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of San Jaun County, Utah filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Alabama and 17 Additional States filed. VIDED.
Sep 07 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 13, 2017.
Oct 06 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017, for all respondents.
Nov 13 2017Brief of respondents intervenor-respondents Center for Biological Diversity and Gulf Restoration Network in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2017Brief of respondents Fish and Wildlife Service, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 21 2017Reply of petitioners Markle Interests, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Oct 25 2018Notice of Change of Address of Markle Interests, et al. not accepted for filing. (Document not of the type that is to be filed electronically -- October 31, 2018)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Miller
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Bvd.
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

mm@pacificlegal.org
561-691-5000
Party name: Markle Interests, et al.
M. Reed Hopper Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

rhopper@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Markle Interests, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Timothy S. Bishop
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

tbishop@mayerbrown.com
312-701-7829
Party name: Fish and Wildlife Service, et al.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Fish and Wildlife Service, et al.
John Thorvald BuseCenter for Biological Diversity
1212 Broadway, Suite 800
Oakland, CA 94612

jbuse@biologicaldiversity.org
5108447125
Party name: intervenor-respondents Center for Biological Diversity and Gulf Restoration Network
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird, LLP
1115 11th Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

paul.beard@alston.com
916-498-3354
Party name: California Cattlemens Association, et al.
Andrew L. Brasher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130

abrasher@ago.state.al.us
(334) 242-7300
Party name: Alabama and 17 Additional States
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Const'l Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Daniel J. O'Hanlon
    Counsel of Record
Kronick Moskovitz Tiedemann & Girard
400 Capitol Mall
27th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

dohanlon@kmtg.com
(916)-321-4500
Party name: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta, et al.
William Perry Pendley
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

wppendley@mountainstateslegal.com
303-292-2021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202)-842-0200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Bernard Seymour Smith
    Counsel of Record
St. Tammany Parish Government
21454 Koop Dr., Suite 2 G
Mandeville, LA 70471

bssmith@stpgov.org
985-898-3427
Party name: St. Tammany Parish
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
(713)-229-1234
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Thomas Jon Ward
    Counsel of Record
The National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

202-266-8200
Party name: THe National Association of Home Builders, et al.
Shawn Terry Welch
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart, LLP
222 South Main Street, Suite 2200
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

stwelch@hollandhart.com
801-799-5800
Party name: San Jaun County, Utah
Steven James LechnerSteven J. Lechner
9830 Xavier Court
Westminster, CO 80031

steven.j.lechner@gmail.com
(720) 936-8363
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.Strickland Brockington Lewis, LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
(678)-347-2208
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543