Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7391
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7391
Title:Darryl Repress, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 11, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10844)
   Decision Date:October 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 12, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOther
Feb 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2018 to March 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 14, 2018.
Mar 14 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 22 2018Reply of petitioner Darryl Repress filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda Greenberg Bryn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
One East Broward Boulevard
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

brenda_bryn@fd.org
954-356-7436
Party name: Darryl Repress
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543