Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7245 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7245 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Timothy Nelson Evans, aka Timothy N. Evans, aka Timothy Evans, aka Tim Evans, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:January 2, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2013-DP-01877-SCT)
   Decision Date:June 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Jan 23 2018Brief of respondent State of Mississippi in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2018Reply of petitioner Timothy Nelson Evans filed.
Main Document
Feb 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 21 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Mar 28 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 10 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alison Steiner
    Counsel of Record
Office of State Public Defender Capital Defense
239 N. Lamar St.
Suite 604
Jackson, MS 39201

astei@ospd.ms.gov
(601) 576-2314
Party name: Timothy Nelson Evans
Attorneys for Respondent
Cameron Leigh Benton
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
550 High Street
Jackson, MS 39201

cbent@ago.state.ms.us
601-359-3747
Party name: State of Mississippi

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543