Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7220
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7220
Title:Peter Carl Bormuth, Petitioner
v.
Jackson County, Michigan
Docketed:December 29, 2017
Linked with 17A320
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1869)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 18 2017Application (17A320) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 5, 2017 to December 21, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Sep 21 2017Application (17A320) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 21, 2017.
Dec 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 29, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief of respondent Jackson County, Michigan in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 20 2018Reply of petitioner Peter Carl Bormuth filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 15 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 22 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Mar 28 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 12 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 18 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 26 2018Rescheduled.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 09 2018Rescheduled.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 16 2018Rescheduled.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 23 2018Rescheduled.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
May 30 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 04 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Peter Carl Bormuth filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 06 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 13 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Carl Bormuth142 West Pearl Street
Jackson, MI 49201

earthprayer@outlook.com
(517) 787-8097
Party name: Peter Carl Bormuth
Attorneys for Respondent
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue, Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: Jackson County, Michigan

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543