Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7213
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7213
Title:Steven Lee, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:December 28, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(2016-0315)
   Decision Date:September 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 29, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 10 2018Waiver of right of respondent State of Ohio to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 13 2018Response Requested. (Due March 15, 2018)
Mar 15 2018Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 11 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 18 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 27 2018Rescheduled.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 09 2018Rescheduled.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brooke Marie Burns
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Ohio Public Defender
250 East Broad Street
Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215

brooke.burns@opd.ohio.gov
614-466-5394
Party name: Steven Lee
Attorneys for Respondent
Steven L. Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Franklin Co. Prosecutor's Off.
373 South High Street, 13th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

staylor@franklincountyohio.gov
614-525-6353
Party name: State of Ohio

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543