Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7183
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7183
Title:Esteban Casabon-Ramirez, aka Esteban Casabon, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 21, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-40227)
   Decision Date:December 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 22, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Jan 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2018 to February 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 21, 2018
Feb 21 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott A. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
440 Louisiana Street
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002

scott_martin@fd.org
(713) 718-4600
Party name: Esteban Casabon-Ramirez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543