Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7171 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7171 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Jesse Guardado, Petitioner
v.
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Docketed:December 20, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-389)
   Decision Date:May 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 19, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 19, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2018 to February 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 20, 2018.
Jan 19 2018Brief amici curiae of Florida Center for Capital Representation at FIU College of Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2018Brief of respondent Julie Jones in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2018Reply of petitioner Jesse Guardado filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 09 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Jesse Guardado filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 20 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 02 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion, VIDED with No. 17-7545).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Billy H. Nolas
    Counsel of Record
227 N. Bronough Street
Ste. 4200
Tallahassee, FL 32301

billy_nolas@fd.org
850-942-8818
Party name: Jesse Guardado
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: Julie Jones
Other
Karen Marcia Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
Florida Center for Capital Representation at FIU College of Law
11200 S.W. 8th Street RDB 1010
Miami, FL 33199

kgottlie@fiu.edu
305-348-3180
Party name: Florida Center for Capital Representation at FIU College of Law, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543