Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7153 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7153 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Richard Gerald Jordan, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:December 19, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2016-DR-00960-SCT)
   Decision Date:June 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 14, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 18, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOther
Jan 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2018 to February 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 20, 2018
Feb 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2018 to March 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 22, 2018.
Mar 22 2018Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition DENIED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 17-7245 is denied. Justice Breyer, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. VIDED. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James William Craig
    Counsel of Record
The Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
4400 S. Carrollton Ave.
New Orleans, LA 70119

jim.craig@macarthurjustice.org
504-620-2259
Party name: Richard Jordan
Attorneys for Respondent
Jason L. DavisOffice of the Attorney General
550 High Street
Suite 1300
Jackson, MS 39201

jdavi@ago.state.ms.us
6013593820
Party name: Mississippi

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543