Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-712
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-712
Title:Kevin Brott, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:November 14, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1466)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 8, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2017)
Nov 28 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Kevin Brott, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 14 2017Waiver of right of respondents United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Downsize DC Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Professor James W. Ely and Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2017Brief amici curiae of National Association of Reversionary Property Owners, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2017Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 22 2017Response Requested. (Due January 22, 2018)
Jan 19 2018Motion of United States for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark F. Hearne II
    Counsel of Record
Arent Fox, LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

thor@arentfox.com
(202) 857-6000
Party name: Kevin Brott, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
James Sherman Burling
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jburling@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.
Karen R. Harned
    Counsel of Record
National Federation of Independent Business Legal
1201 F Street, N.W.
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

karen.harned@nfib.org
202-314-2061
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al.
Steven James Lechner
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80277

lechner@mountainstateslegal.com
303-292-2021
Party name: Professor James W. Ely and Mountain States Legal Foundation
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Downsize DC Foundation, et al.
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: National Association of Reversionary Property Owners, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543