Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7062 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7062 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Darrell Wayne Frederick, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:December 12, 2017
Linked with 17A358
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(D-2015-15)
   Decision Date:May 25, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 7, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2017Application (17A358) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 5, 2017 to December 4, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Oct 02 2017Application (17A358) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 4, 2017.
Dec 04 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 11, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Jan 11 2018Brief of respondent State of Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gina Kay Walker
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma County Public Defender's Office
320 Robert S. Kerr, Rm. 611
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

gina.walker@oscn.net
405-713-1550
Party name: Darrell Frederick
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer J. Dickson
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st St.
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: State of Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543