Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-702
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-702
Title:Lewis Tein, P.L., et al., Petitioners
v.
Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida
Docketed:November 13, 2017
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Third District
   Case Numbers:(3D16-2826)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 13, 2017)
Dec 13 2017Brief of respondent Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 09 2018Reply of petitioners Lewis Tein, P.L., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Curtis Miner
    Counsel of Record
255 Alhambra Circle, Penthouse
Coral Gables, FL 33134

curt@colson.com
(305) 476-7400
Party name: Lewis Tein, P.L., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert Osley Saunooke
    Counsel of Record
Saunooke Law Firm, PA
18620 S.W. 39th Court
Miramar, FL 33029

ndnlawyer@hotmail.com
561-302-5297
Party name: Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543