Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-694
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-694
Title:The Ritz-Carlton Development Company, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Krishna Narayan, et al.
Docketed:November 9, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Hawaii
   Case Numbers:(SCWC-12-0000819)
   Decision Date:July 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 9, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 11, 2017)
Nov 28 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 11, 2017 to January 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 10, 2018.
Dec 11 2017Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States Of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2018Brief of respondents Krishna Narayan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 24 2018Reply of petitioners Ritz-Carlton Development Company, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Ritz-Carlton Development Company, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Krishna Narayan, et al.
Other
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States Of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543