Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6926
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6926
Title:Lavada Carreon, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 29, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11239)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 29, 2017)
Dec 19 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 29, 2017 to January 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 29, 2018.
Jan 29 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lavada Carreon
    Counsel of Record
#39097-177
FMC Carswell
P.O. Box 27137
Fort Worth, TX 76127

Party name: Lavada Carreon
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543