Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6887
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6887
Title:Benjie Earl Wright, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 27, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-12979)
   Decision Date:October 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 27, 2017)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Dec 19 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2017 to January 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 26, 2018.
Jan 26 2018Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 09 2018Reply of petitioner Benjie Wright filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 21 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory Antonio Samms
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Gregory A. Samms P.A.
113 Almeria Avenue
Coral Gables, FL 33134

sammslaw@gmail.com
7862711037
Party name: Gregory Samms
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543