Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6883 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6883 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Carlos Trevino, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:November 27, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-70019)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 27, 2017)
OtherMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServicePetitionAppendixAppendix
Dec 18 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2017 to February 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2018.
Feb 26 2018Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 12 2018Reply of petitioner Carlos Trevino filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Ginsburg joins, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Ritenour Jr.The Ritenour Law Firm, P.C.
115 E. Travis Street
Suite 746
San Antonio, TX 78205

John@Ritenourlaw.net
210-222-0125
Party name: Carlos Trevino
Attorneys for Respondent
Fredericka Searle Sargent
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711-2548

fredericka.sargent@oag.texas.gov
5129361400
Party name: Lorie Davis

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543