Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6856
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6856
Title:Tawnya Bearcomesout, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-30276)
   Decision Date:August 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 22, 2017)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 07 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 03 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 13 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 27 2018Response Requested. (Due July 27, 2018)
Jul 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2018.
Jul 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 27, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 27 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 05 2018Response to Respondent's Memorandum to Petition for Writ of Ceriorari of Tawnya Bearcomesout submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anthony R. Gallagher
    Counsel of Record
The Federal Defenders of Montana Headquarters Office
104 Second Street South
Suite 301
Great Falls, MT 59401

anthony_gallagher@fd.org
4067275328
Party name: Tawnya Bearcomesout
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543