Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6844 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6844 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Todd Wessinger, Petitioner
v.
Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Docketed:November 21, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-70027)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 21, 2017)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 21 2017Brief of respondent Darrel Vannoy, Warden in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 05 2018Reply of petitioner Todd Wessinger filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Rescheduled.
Feb 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 13 2018Rescheduled.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 05 2018Petition DENIED Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)
Mar 30 2018Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rebecca L. Hudsmith
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender for the Middle and Western Districts of Louisiana
102 Versailles Boulevard
Suite 816
Lafayette, LA 70506

rebecca_hudsmith@fd.org
337-262-6336
Party name: Todd Wessinger
Attorneys for Respondent
Dale R. Lee
    Counsel of Record
District Attorney's Office
222 St. Louis Street,5th Floor
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

dale.lee@ebrda.org
(225) 389-3453
Party name: Darrel Vannoy

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543