Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-680
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-680
Title:Texas Democratic Party, et al., Appellants
v.
Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Docketed:November 8, 2017
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Texas
   Case Numbers:(SA-11-CV-360)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2017Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due December 8, 2017)
Nov 06 2017Appendix of appellants filed.
Dec 08 2017Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Greg Abbott, In His Official Capacity as Governor of Texas, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2017Reply of appellants Texas Democratic Party, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018Appeal dismissed for want of jurisdiction.
Feb 20 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Chad Wilson Dunn
    Counsel of Record
Brazil & Dunn
4201 Cypress Creek Pkwy.
Suite 530
Houston, TX 77068

chad@brazilanddunn.com
(281) 580-6310
Party name: Texas Democratic Party, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512-590-2655
Party name: Greg Abbott, In His Official Capacity as Governor of Texas, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543