Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-68
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-68
Title:Dale Lee Norman, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:July 13, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC15-650)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 13, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 14, 2017)
Jul 26 2017Waiver of right of respondent Florida to respond filed.
Aug 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 11 2017Response Requested. (Due September 11, 2017)
Sep 01 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 11, 2017.
Oct 11 2017Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Oct 24 2017Reply of petitioner Dale L. Norman filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen Porter Halbrook
    Counsel of Record
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

protell@aol.com
703-352-7276
Party name: Dale L. Norman
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

Amit.Agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
(850) 414-3688
Party name: Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543