Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6751
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6751
Title:Francisco Gutierrez-Lopez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 13, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11469)
   Decision Date:August 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 13, 2017)
Dec 06 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2017 to January 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 07 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 12, 2018.
Jan 12 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christopher Curtis
    Counsel of Record
819 Taylor Street, Room 9A10
Fort Worth, TX 76102

(817) 978-2753
Party name: Francisco Gutierrez-Lopez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543