Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6735 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6735 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Randy W. Tundidor, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:November 14, 2017
Linked with 17A277
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC14-2276)
   Decision Date:April 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 05 2017Application (17A277) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 26, 2017 to November 25, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Sep 15 2017Application (17A277) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 25, 2017.
Nov 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 14, 2017)
Dec 05 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2017 to January 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 05 2017Motion of Florida for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (December 11, 2017)
Dec 05 2017Motion of Florida for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (December 11, 2017)
Dec 11 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2018.
Jan 22 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Feb 02 2018Reply of petitioner Randy W. Tundidor filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Feb 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018Petition DENIED Justice Breyer, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion). Justice Sotomayor, joined by Justice Ginsburg, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion). VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gary Lee Caldwell
    Counsel of Record
421 Third Street
West Palm Beach, FL 33401

gcaldwel@pd15.state.fl.us
(561) 355-7600
Party name: Randy W. Tundidor
Attorneys for Respondent
Leslie Teresa Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1515 North Flagler Drive, Suite 900
West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Leslie.Campbell@myfloridalegal.com
561-837-5016
Party name: State of Florida
Lisa-Marie Krause Lerner
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1515 N. Flagler Dr.
9th Floor
West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Lisamarie.lerner@myfloridalegal.com
5678375000
Party name: Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543