Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6721
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6721
Title:Adrian Efrain Ontiveros-Cedillo, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 9, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-41682)
   Decision Date:October 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 11, 2017)
Dec 08 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 11, 2017 to January 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 11 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 10, 2018
Jan 10 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.
May 25 2018Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott A. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

(713) 718-4600
Party name: Adrian Efrain Ontiveros-Cedillo
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543