Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6689 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6689 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tyrone Chalmers, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:November 7, 2017
Linked with 17A184
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Western Division
   Case Numbers:(W2016-02413-CCA-R28-PD)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 9, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2017Application (17A184) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 7, 2017 to November 6, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Aug 16 2017Application (17A184) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 6, 2017.
Nov 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 7, 2017)
Dec 07 2017Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2017Reply of petitioner Tyrone Chalmers filed.
Main Document
Dec 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jerome Curtis Del Pino
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
810 Broadway
Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

(615) 736-5047
Party name: Tyrone Chalmers
Attorneys for Respondent
Nicholas White Spangler
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Tennessee Attorney General
425 5th Avenue North
Nashville, TN 37219

nick.spangler@ag.tn.gov
615-741-3486
Party name: Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543