Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6680
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6680
Title:William M. Eaton, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4380)
   Decision Date:July 5, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 22, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 6, 2017)
Nov 15 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Nov 28 2017Rescheduled.
Dec 07 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 03 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 12 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner William M. Eaton filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 27 2018Response Requested. (Due July 27, 2018)
Jul 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2018.
Jul 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 27, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 28, 2018.
Aug 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 27, 2018 to September 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William M. Eaton#27089-045
MCFP Springfield
P.O. Box 4000
Springfield, MO 65801

Party name: William M. Eaton
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543