Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6628
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6628
Title:Rosa Orozco, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:November 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-60186)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Nov 13 2017Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court’s Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system.
Nov 29 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2017 to January 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Nov 29 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 3, 2018.
Jan 03 2018Brief of respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Jan 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen Lee Weinstein
    Counsel of Record
36 Elm Street
New Providence, NJ 07974

sweinstein16@gmail.com
908-464-7893
Party name: Rosa Orozco
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543