Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6580 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6580 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Dale Glenn Middleton, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:October 31, 2017
Linked with 17A189
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC12-2469)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 1, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2017Application (17A189) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 30, 2017 to October 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Aug 22 2017Application (17A189) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 29, 2017.
Oct 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 30, 2017)
Nov 28 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 30, 2017 to January 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 06 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 16, 2018.
Jan 16 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Feb 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion). Justice Sotomayor, joined by Justice Ginsburg, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion). VIDED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Anderson
    Counsel of Record
421 Third Street
West Palm Beach, FL 33401

appeals@pd15.org
561-355-7600
Party name: Dale Glenn Middleton
Attorneys for Respondent
Lisa-Marie Krause Lerner
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1515 N. Flagler Dr.
9th Floor
West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Lisamarie.lerner@myfloridalegal.com
5678375000
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543