Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-646
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-646
Title:Terance Martez Gamble, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16760)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Nov 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 3, 2018.
Nov 30 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2017 to January 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 04 2017Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center and Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 26 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2018 to February 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 28 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 2, 2018.
Jan 16 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 30 2018Reply of petitioner Terance Gamble filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 23 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 01 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 4, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 25, 2018.
Sep 04 2018Brief of petitioner Terance Gamble filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentOther
Sep 07 2018Brief amicus curiae of Howard University School of Law Thurgood Marshall Civil Rights Center in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of U.S. Navy-Marine Corps Appellate Defense Division, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Criminal Defense Experts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Criminal Procedure Professors Stephen E. Henderson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Senator Orrin Hatch filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 5, 2018
Oct 15 2018Record requested from U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Oct 18 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of Alabama is electronic and located on PACER.
Oct 19 2018CIRCULATED
Oct 25 2018Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 29 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic, complete and located on PACER.
Nov 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2018Motion for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed by Texas, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 01 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOtherOther
Nov 01 2018Brief amici curiae of National Indigenous Women's Resource Center et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2018Opposition of petitioner to motion of Texas, et al., filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 06 2018Response of respondent to motion of Texas, et al., filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 06 2018Reply of Texas, et al. in support of motion, filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 19 2018Motion of Texas, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for enlargement of time for oral argument is GRANTED and the time is allotted as follows: 40 minutes for the petitioner, 30 minutes for the respondent, and 10 minutes for Texas, et al.
Nov 20 2018Letter of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Nov 21 2018Reply of petitioner Terance Gamble filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018RESCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT ON Thursday, December 6, 2018
Dec 06 2018Argued. For petitioner: Louis A. Chaiten, Cleveland, Ohio. For respondent: Eric J. Feigin, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For Texas, et al., as amici curiae: Kyle D. Hawkins, Texas Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Louis A. Chaiten
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114

lachaiten@jonesday.com
216-586-7244
Party name: Terance Gamble
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Bryan Wall
    Counsel of Record
Principal Deputy Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

charlene.w.goodwin@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Texas, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, California, Colorado, Connecticut, Florida, Georgia, Idaho, Illinois, Iowa, Kansas, Louisiana, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Montana, Nebraska, New Jersey, New Mexico, New York, North Carolina, Ohio, Oklahoma, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, South Carolina, South Dakota, Utah, Vermont, Virginia, Washington, West Virginia, and Wisconsin
Mary Kathryn Nagle
    Counsel of Record
Pipestem Law, P.C.
320 South Boston Ave, Suite 1705
Tulsa, OK 74103

mknagle@pipestemlaw.com
2024070591
Party name: National Indigenous Women's Resource Center and National Congress of American Indians
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin,LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 22305

gtodd@sidley.com
2027368760
Party name: National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, United States Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, International Municipal Lawyers Association, National District Attorneys Association, and National Sherrifs' Association
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: Law Professors
Peder K. Batalden
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Ave.
8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505-4681

pbatalden@horvitzlevy.com
818-995-0800
Party name: Criminal Procedure Professors Stephen E. Henderson, George C. Thomas, III, Michael J. Z. Mannheimer, and Kiel Brennan-Marquez
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Criminal Defense Experts
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center and Cato Institute
Adam Harris Kurland
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law
2900 Van Ness St. NW
Washington, DC 20008

akurland@law.howard.edu
3015031608
Party name: Howard University School of Law Thurgood Marshall Civil Rights Center
Jonathan L. Marcus
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

jonathan.marcus@skadden.com
202-371-7596
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, National Association of Federal Defenders, and Texas Criminal Defense Lawyers Association
Daniel Evan Rosinski
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Navy-Marine Corps Appellate Defense Division
1254 Charles Morris St. SE, Suite 100
Washington Navy Yard, DC 20374

daniel.e.rosinski@navy.mil
2026858506
Party name: U.S. Navy-Marine Corps Appellate Defense Division, U.S. Coast Guard Office Of Member Advocacy And Legal Assistance—Appellate Defense, U.S. Air Force Appellate Defense Division, U.S. Army Defense Appellate Division
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Senator Orrin Hatch
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
923 Gardens Boulevard
Charlottesville, VA 22901

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543